Financial history WOTTON UNDER EDGE UNITED CHARITIES FOR THE POOR

Charity number: 203467
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £340 £348 £354 £362 £368
Total expenditure £300 £400 £300 £400 £400
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A