Trustees WOTTON UNDER EDGE UNITED CHARITIES FOR THE POOR

Charity number: 203467
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Anthony Alexander Chair 13 March 2019
UNITED ALMSHOUSE CHARITIES
Received: On time
PERRY AND HYETT APPRENTICING AND EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
BLUECOAT SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
David Baird Trustee 16 March 2022
PERRY AND HYETT APPRENTICING AND EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
BLUECOAT SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Teresa Louise Creese Trustee 28 June 2021
UNITED ALMSHOUSE CHARITIES
Received: On time
THE KINDERGARTEN
Overdue by 5 days
PERRY AND HYETT APPRENTICING AND EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
BLUECOAT SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Lucy Stanley Trustee 10 March 2021
UNITED ALMSHOUSE CHARITIES
Received: On time
PERRY AND HYETT APPRENTICING AND EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
BLUECOAT SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Jonathan Anthony Turner Trustee 13 June 2018
UNITED ALMSHOUSE CHARITIES
Received: On time
PERRY AND HYETT APPRENTICING AND EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
BLUECOAT SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
DR Sarah Catherine Robinson Trustee 08 March 2017
UNITED ALMSHOUSE CHARITIES
Received: On time
PERRY AND HYETT APPRENTICING AND EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
BLUECOAT SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Terry Luker Trustee 01 June 2015
UNITED ALMSHOUSE CHARITIES
Received: On time
PERRY AND HYETT APPRENTICING AND EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
PAUL BARTON Trustee 01 June 2014
UNITED ALMSHOUSE CHARITIES
Received: On time
PERRY AND HYETT APPRENTICING AND EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
BLUECOAT SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
PAULINE CLARE LATIMER Trustee 13 November 2013
UNITED ALMSHOUSE CHARITIES
Received: On time
EDITH STRAIN (NURSING)
Received: On time
PERRY AND HYETT APPRENTICING AND EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
BLUECOAT SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
GEORGE DESMOND CARPENTER Trustee
PERRY AND HYETT APPRENTICING AND EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
BLUECOAT SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time