Accounts and annual returns TIMSON FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 203475
Charity reporting is overdue by 25 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 Overdue Overdue by 25 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Overdue Overdue by 25 days
Annual return 30 June 2020 25 August 2021 117 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 04 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 20 May 2019 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 30 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required