Financial history CHARITY FOR ECCLESIASTICAL PURPOSES IN CONNECTION WITH THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND

Charity number: 203680
Charity reporting is overdue by 19 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £12.68k £11.86k £8.56k £8.87k £4.11k
Total expenditure £11.43k £5.63k £1.44k £9.57k £20.72k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A