THE OTTERTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 203780
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £5.76k £6.56k £6.64k £6.54k £4.91k
Total expenditure £5.74k £7.07k £12.03k £5.60k £4.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A