ST PETERS ALMSHOUSE CHARITIES

Charity number: 204049
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 27 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 21 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 14 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required