Trustees COOMBE COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 204158
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

21 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MICHAEL CHARLES MCLENING Chair
None on record
ALISTAIR TIMOTHY DONOHEW Trustee 01 August 2020
None on record
ROSE BARNECUT Trustee 01 August 2020
None on record
IAN STUART ELLIOT Trustee 01 April 2019
None on record
Jacqueline Cossey Trustee 01 April 2019
None on record
JOHN THOMAS COSSEY Trustee 01 April 2019
None on record
Dr DON WEERASIRIE Trustee 25 April 2016
None on record
Mrs Debbie Hickman Trustee 25 April 2016
None on record
MATTHEW LUCAS PENGELLY Trustee 25 April 2016
None on record
Julian John Le Vavasseur dit Durell Trustee 25 April 2016
None on record
STEPHEN GREENWOOD Trustee 13 April 2015
None on record
SUSAN ANNE LE VAVASSEUR DIT DURELL Trustee 19 August 2013
None on record
ANNE GREENWOOD Trustee 13 August 2013
None on record
FREDERICK AUSTIN CUNDY Trustee 03 September 2012
St John's with Trinity Trewoon Methodist Church
Received: On time
TREVOR STANLEY DAWES Trustee 03 September 2012
None on record
SHEILA SUSAN DAWES Trustee 03 September 2012
None on record
JEAN PARSONS Trustee
FRIENDS OF THE ROYAL CORNWALL HOSPITAL
Received: On time
GRAHAM JOHN LAWRENCE Trustee
None on record
MARY PATRICIA ROUND Trustee
None on record
DELINE ANNE ROOKES Trustee
None on record
PETER ANTHONY JULIAN Trustee
None on record