EMBERTON UNITED CHARITY

Charity number: 204221
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 08 August 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 05 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 06 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 11 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 13 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 26 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 09 May 2017 On time Download