JANE EADITH CATHERINE CAULFEILD BEQUEST

Charity number: 204295
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 November 2020 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 26 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 12 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 07 December 2016 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required