THE WIVELISCOMBE DISPENSARY TRUST

Charity number: 204333
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 04/02/2016 04/02/2017 04/02/2018 04/02/2019 04/02/2020
Total gross income £517 £500 £522 £583 £873
Total expenditure £400 £380 £413 £450 £750
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A