The Alice Marshall Hall

Charity number: 204631
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £5.37k £5.30k £4.14k £4.13k £21.79k
Total expenditure £6.01k £4.09k £4.49k £3.88k £11.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £19.34k