Trustees GREAT STAUGHTON PARISH CHARITIES

Charity number: 204671
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Lesley Nicole Bland Chair 01 April 2017
GREAT STAUGHTON ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY (CONSISTING OF THE CHURCH LAND CHARITY AND THE BELL ROPE CHARITY)
Overdue by 172 days
James Gray Duberly Trustee 16 March 2023
None on record
Lorraine Elizabeth Goody Trustee 24 August 2021
WEST HUNTS FRIENDSHIP CLUB
Received: On time
William Harry Mumford Trustee 15 October 2020
None on record
Martin Macfarlane Trustee 17 July 2019
GREAT STAUGHTON ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY (CONSISTING OF THE CHURCH LAND CHARITY AND THE BELL ROPE CHARITY)
Overdue by 172 days
Janet Rosemary Perrett Trustee 01 April 2017
THE ELY DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
GREAT STAUGHTON ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY (CONSISTING OF THE CHURCH LAND CHARITY AND THE BELL ROPE CHARITY)
Overdue by 172 days