CAMBRIDGE ROYAL ALBERT BENEVOLENT SOCIETY

Charity number: 204757
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2020 16 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 16 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 28 February 2019 05 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 25 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 28 February 2018 22 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 22 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 28 February 2017 11 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 11 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 29 February 2016 31 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2016 31 August 2016 On time Download