CAMBRIDGE ROYAL ALBERT BENEVOLENT SOCIETY

Charity number: 204757
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 29/02/2016 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020
Total gross income £183.91k £413.35k £226.42k £209.66k £244.53k
Total expenditure £159.47k £193.48k £272.68k £307.12k £427.65k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £500 £370 £700 £500