CAMBRIDGE ROYAL ALBERT BENEVOLENT SOCIETY

Charity number: 204757
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ann Bullock Trustee 31 August 2018
THE CAMBRIDGE ROYAL ALBERT HOMES Recently registered
Martin John Tyson Trustee 09 July 2014
KINETIKA PEOPLE Received: On time
EDWARD HAROLD THACKRAY FCIOB Chair None on record
John Edwin Martin Trustee 17 May 2017
THE CAMBRIDGE ROYAL ALBERT HOMES Recently registered
Roger James Winter Trustee 24 July 2019
THE CAMBRIDGE ROYAL ALBERT HOMES Recently registered
ROSALIND ANNE BIRD Trustee 13 September 2012 None on record
SUSAN CAROLINE MCCAVE Trustee
THE CAMBRIDGE ROYAL ALBERT HOMES Recently registered