CORONA WORLDWIDE

Charity number: 204802
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 07 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 02 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 02 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 19 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 04 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required