UNITED NON-ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITIES

Charity number: 204834
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOHN EDWARD FRANKLIN Chair
PHILIP MARNER'S CHARITY Received: On time
ST JOHN'S HOSPITAL Received: On time
FRIENDS OF CIRENCESTER PARISH CHURCH Received: On time
Mary Cobbett Trustee 04 February 2021
PHILIP MARNER'S CHARITY Received: On time
ST JOHN'S HOSPITAL Received: On time
Stephanie Philippa Robbins Trustee 04 February 2021
PHILIP MARNER'S CHARITY Received: On time
ST JOHN'S HOSPITAL Received: On time
PETER JOHN COTTEY Trustee
PHILIP MARNER'S CHARITY Received: On time
ST JOHN'S HOSPITAL Received: On time
FRIENDS OF CIRENCESTER PARISH CHURCH Received: On time
Roy Richardson Trustee 11 July 2017
PHILIP MARNER'S CHARITY Received: On time
ST JOHN'S HOSPITAL Received: On time
GEOFFREY THOMAS ADAMS Trustee 06 February 2014
THE CHRISTOPHER AND SARAH ALDAM BOWLY'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY Received: On time
PHILIP MARNER'S CHARITY Received: On time
CIRENCESTER CIVIC SOCIETY Received: On time
ALISON MARY MOORE WARD Trustee 31 January 2012
PHILIP MARNER'S CHARITY Received: On time
Margaret Anne Blumsom Trustee 15 November 2018
PHILIP MARNER'S CHARITY Received: On time
ST JOHN'S HOSPITAL Received: On time
CHURN PROJECT LIMITED Received: 9 days late