NORTHAMPTONSHIRE RECORD SOCIETY

Charity number: 204957
Charity reporting is overdue by 359 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 359 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 15 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 15 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 21 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 21 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 07 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 12 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 21 July 2016 On time Download