NORTHAMPTONSHIRE RECORD SOCIETY

Charity number: 204957
Charity reporting is overdue by 359 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £26.60k £24.63k £29.42k £26.19k £26.19k
Total expenditure £26.53k £24.02k £24.87k £22.85k £22.85k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A