ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS CAMBRIDGE AND DISTRICT BRANCH

Charity number: 205098
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 19 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 19 August 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 10 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 10 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 19 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 19 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 14 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 14 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 24 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 24 July 2017 On time Download