Accounts and annual returns CHARITY OF JOHN CAREWAY

Charity number: 205143
Charity reporting is overdue by 25 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 25 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 25 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 09 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 September 2020 240 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required