RSPCA SOUTH EAST AND WEST DEVON BRANCH

Charity number: 205154
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £1.34m £1.21m £1.41m £1.35m £1.10m
Total expenditure £1.05m £980.29k £962.75k £979.13k £928.78k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £669.01k £547.97k £739.97k £744.34k £539.19k
Income - Other trading activities £592.02k £573.95k £582.81k £525.70k £496.80k
Income - Charitable activities £54.88k £56.49k £52.33k £46.21k £33.00k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £28.14k £32.90k £32.02k £34.57k £34.57k
Income - Other £17 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £623.13k £373.67k £605.32k £705.44k £496.33k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £574.73k £545.00k £548.59k £487.30k £500.49k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £435.29k £414.16k £491.82k £428.30k
Expenditure - Governance £48.68k £21.25k £17.20k £15.99k £13.85k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £5.36k £10.15k £11.03k £11.56k £11.82k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0