ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS PETERBOROUGH AND DISTRICT BRANCH

Charity number: 205155
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 14 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 07 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 07 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 05 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 05 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 11 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 11 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 14 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

14 June 2017 On time Download