SONNING AND DISTRICT WELFARE AND EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 205224
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.43k £1.54k £1.58k £1.62k £3.92k
Total expenditure £2.95k £0 £750 £1.21k £2.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A