TAUNTON AND DISTRICT MENCAP SOCIETY

Charity number: 205244
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £25.23k £24.14k £19.74k £27.85k £15.75k
Total expenditure £25.95k £28.58k £26.66k £21.02k £18.82k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A