Accounts and annual returns ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS ISLE OF WIGHT BRANCH

Charity number: 205311
Charity reporting is up to date (182 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 April 2024 182 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 30 April 2024 182 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 30 September 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 29 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2021 363 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window