SCOULOUDI FOUNDATION

Charity number: 205685
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 07/02/2016 07/02/2017 07/02/2018 07/02/2019 07/02/2020
Total gross income £210.65k £173.78k £198.07k £210.40k £200.15k
Total expenditure £274.04k £262.02k £230.30k £258.98k £258.53k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A