ROYAL HOSPITAL FOR NEURO-DISABILITY

Charity number: 205907
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £38.20m £38.29m £43.58m £41.68m £42.99m
Total expenditure £35.57m £37.26m £38.86m £40.87m £44.16m
Income from government contracts £33.50m £34.34m £9.69m £10.25m £10.64m
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.73m £2.33m £5.36m £2.41m £1.81m
Income - Other trading activities £323.00k £258.00k £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £35.56m £36.20m £37.35m £38.59m £40.62m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £418.00k £551.00k £646.00k £470.00k £404.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £227.00k £207.00k £147.00k
Income - Legacies £694.00k £0 £2.71m £653.00k £732.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £34.46m £36.26m £37.80m £39.81m £43.17m
Expenditure - Raising funds £940.00k £997.00k £1.07m £1.06m £994.00k
Expenditure - Governance £47.00k £188.00k £120.00k £47.00k £112.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £122.00k £131.00k £122.00k £111.00k £79.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0