COMPTON DANDO CHURCH ESTATE TRUST

Charity number: 205949
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £9.59k £10.15k £10.73k £10.52k £10.66k
Total expenditure £10.16k £9.96k £5.14k £12.20k £3.66k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A