ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS PLYMOUTH AND SOUTH WEST DEVON BRANCH

Charity number: 205961
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £168.17k £125.42k £167.75k £670.15k £472.13k
Total expenditure £137.67k £114.02k £123.43k £171.27k £146.12k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £593.28k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £62.74k N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £12.65k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £1.48k N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £563.83k N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £126.15k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £45.11k N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £1.63k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £4.93k N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A