Financial history TILEHURST VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 205968
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £17.39k £17.12k £17.23k £16.21k £21.27k
Total expenditure £12.88k £14.84k £14.97k £18.58k £22.02k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k