MANUDEN UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 205990
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 25 February 2020 117 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 23 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 30 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required