MANUDEN UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 205990
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MRS EVE ROBERTS Trustee 28 August 2011 None on record
STEPHEN CHARLES KEMP Trustee 20 October 2005 None on record
Lizzie Grant Trustee 18 October 2016 None on record
Elizabeth Barbara Cheney Trustee 01 December 2020
MANUDEN VILLAGE HALL AND SPORTS TRUST Received: On time
REV MARGARET DAVIS Chair 21 November 2013 None on record