Accounts and annual returns JESUS HOSPITAL

Charity number: 206368
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 September 2020 27 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 September 2020 27 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 September 2019 15 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 September 2019 15 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 September 2018 11 October 2019 74 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 September 2018 11 October 2019 74 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 September 2017 04 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 September 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

04 May 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 September 2016 26 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 September 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

26 July 2017 On time Download Open in new window