CHESHAM, AMERSHAM & DISTRICT MENCAP SOCIETY

Charity number: 206478
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £11.80k £50.65k £10.46k £6.86k £4.63k
Total expenditure £13.33k £22.11k £20.13k £14.55k £20.11k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A