CHESHAM, AMERSHAM & DISTRICT MENCAP SOCIETY

Charity number: 206478
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
WENDY DUNN Trustee 08 January 2014 None on record
MARY ELIZABETH PRUDEN Trustee
CHILTERN FRIENDS OF THE ENDEAVOUR Received: On time
JOHN WILLS Trustee 08 January 2014 None on record
MATTHEW JAMES REAVEY Trustee None on record
Lesley Donaldson Trustee 31 March 2013 None on record
Susan Marie Masters Trustee 25 January 2016 None on record
Patricia Anne Milner Chair 17 March 2013
CHILTERNS GATEWAY CLUB Received: On time
JILLIAN LOUISE THOMPSON Trustee 24 March 2013
HIGH WYCOMBE GATEWAY CLUB Received: On time