Trustees ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS SUSSEX NORTH & BRIGHTON BRANCH
Charity number: 206630
Charity reporting is up to date (92 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DOUG TAYLOR | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Alexandra Stubbings | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
GEOFFREY LESLIE ANDERSON | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Philip Michael Browning | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Rachel Margaret Gales | Trustee | 09 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Denise Emms | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Louise Bilby | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Keith Langridge | Trustee | 15 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
ANN BOLTON | Trustee | 23 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
JEANETTE BRAZIER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.