ST BARNABAS SOUTHWOLD

Charity number: 206792
Charity reporting is overdue by 445 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018
Total gross income £460.54k £460.63k £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £514.77k £514.77k £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A