Trustees FIVE ASH DOWN VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 207068
Charity reporting is overdue by 88 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jennifer DENNISON | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Iris Huxley | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shelagh Burton | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Michael Humphrey | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ms S McGowan | Trustee | 01 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Hanson | Trustee | 06 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
VANESSA WOOD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBIN HART | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROL ECKERSLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.