ASTHALL CHURCH LANDS

Charity number: 207088
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 17 November 2021 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 21 March 2020 142 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 13 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 11 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required