Financial history THE WILLIAM SHADWELL CHARITY

Charity number: 207366
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £10.85k £10.02k £11.84k £13.29k £11.62k
Total expenditure £15.38k £6.58k £9.40k £16.27k £16.54k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A