FRANCIS BROOKE FUEL CHARITY

Charity number: 207534
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 09 March 2020 130 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 01 November 2018 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 23 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 19 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required