Dogfen lywodraethu THE GRANGE CENTRE FOR PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11/01/1939 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/01/1964 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/01/1966 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/12/1971 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/09/1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/09/1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/09/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/09/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/05/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/07/2006 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21/12/2015
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY VIRTUE OF DISABILITY, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, GENERALLY AND IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND CARE BY VARIOUS MEANS INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE PROVISION OF: 1.1 ACCOMMODATION INCLUDING RESIDENTIAL CARE AND SOCIAL HOUSING 1.2 TRAINING AND TRAINING FACILITIES 1.3 DAY SERVICES 1.4 ASSISTANCE AND SUPPORT FINDING EMPLOYMENT 1.5 FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND SUPPORT THEREBY MAXIMISING SUCH PERSONS CAPACITY FOR INDEPENDENCE, THE EXERCISE OF CHOICE AND THE ABILITY OF SUCH PERSONS TO MANAGE THEIR OWN AFFAIRS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.