THE SIR OSWALD STOLL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 207939
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £3.68m £3.48m £4.08m £3.85m £3.63m
Total expenditure £3.56m £3.45m £4.83m £4.01m £2.99m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £500.00k £500.00k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.09m £919.87k £1.39m £810.12k £548.63k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £113.00k £116.42k £0
Income - Charitable activities £3.14k £48.84k £2.57m £5.30k £28.66k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £28.53k £2.85k £0 £1.90k £613
Income - Other £2.56m £2.51m £0 £2.92m £3.05m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £124.33k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £650.79k £728.81k £3.76m £676.57k £548.54k
Expenditure - Raising funds £497.02k £280.72k £355.67k £281.23k £212.76k
Expenditure - Governance £99.53k £70.19k £44.53k £104.85k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £260.05k £0
Expenditure - Other £2.41m £2.37m £711.28k £3.05m £2.23m