BRITISH DENTAL ASSOCIATION BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 208146
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £314.67k £351.71k £350.41k £369.49k £354.59k
Total expenditure £255.08k £267.70k £336.36k £315.89k £350.90k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A