Trustees GISLINGHAM UNITED CHARITY

Charity number: 208340
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
REVEREND DOCTOR ALAN HARDING Chair
None on record
Peter Adams Trustee 21 July 2023
None on record
Julie Claire Bell Trustee 26 May 2023
FRIENDS OF ST. MARY'S CHURCH, GISLINGHAM
Received: On time
Chris Pitt Trustee 26 May 2023
None on record
Paul Smith Trustee 15 July 2022
None on record
Sheila Bailey Trustee 19 November 2021
None on record
Robert Kempster Gray Trustee 20 November 2020
None on record
Linda Pettit Trustee 27 October 2020
None on record
Terence Roy Williams Trustee 30 September 2020
None on record
Alan Frank Stanley Trustee 20 January 2020
None on record