ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS ESSEX SOUTH WEST BRANCH

Charity number: 208381
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £77.35k £44.50k £33.31k £68.32k £35.10k
Total expenditure £56.89k £54.67k £32.82k £20.37k £21.88k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A