ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS ESSEX SOUTH WEST BRANCH

Charity number: 208381
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Manisha Aatkar Trustee 15 August 2019 None on record
Laura Monaghan Trustee 24 June 2021 None on record
SHARON JACQUELINE GILLETT Trustee 15 August 2019 None on record
CHIARA KHAN Trustee 01 July 2019 None on record
Dr Emma Jarratt Trustee 15 November 2018 None on record
David Stewart Andrews Trustee 10 January 2019 None on record