THE CHILDREN'S FAMILY TRUST

Charity number: 208607
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 21 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 15 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 15 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 29 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 29 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 18 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 18 May 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 15 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 16 May 2016 On time Download