Trustees THE HACKNEY HORSE SOCIETY
Charity number: 208905

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
William Murrell | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Frederick Eastwood | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Billy Ward | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Cooper | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
JOHN CRESSWELL | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hope Nebbeling | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Paul Peters | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Lydia Hardy | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
James William Wenham | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Colin Reginald Hurd Mr | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD TERENCE WALKER JNR | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
ERNEST ALAN WALSH JNR | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE MARIE PETERS | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARK ANTONY HARDY | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT WILLIAM ROBERTSON | Trustee | 01 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
JANICE CLOUGH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
REUBEN NICHOLAS CARTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALLAN WARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUE BARRACLOUGH | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.